CARDIFF YMCA (1910) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cardiff YMCA (1910) Trust aims to promote and support the educational, social, physical and psychological development of the community. Providing funding to organisations and individuals in Cardiff and the Vale in an inclusive, ethical and transparent manner; grants are made by majority decision of Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cardiff
- Newport City
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 02 October 2015: CIO registration
- 13 June 2017: Funds received from 1111710 CARDIFF YMCA 1910 SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER COOMBS | Chair | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
John James Bettles JP | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Phil Williams | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Scott Keddle | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Ashfield | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hales | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LITTLECHILD MBE, JP | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Helen Gunter cllr | Trustee | 27 January 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £311.43k | £210.26k | £622.45k | £156.92k | £294.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £278.79k | £177.69k | £269.70k | £394.97k | £270.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £513.70k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £51.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £35.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £22.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £265.75k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £178.71k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £3.95k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CARDIFF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) PROVIDING FINANCE AND SUPPORTING THE ASSOCIATION’S CHARITABLE WORK IN THE COMMUNITY (INCLUDING SUPPORTING ACTIVITIES WHICH ENCOURAGE AND DEVELOP THE INDIVIDUAL'S MIND, BODY AND SPIRIT); (B) HOLDING PROPERTY FOR CHARITABLE USE WITHIN THE SOUTH WALES REGION; AND (C) HOLDING PROPERTY AND OTHER ASSETS FOR INVESTMENT PURPOSES IF IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES THIS WOULD FURTHER THE ASSOCIATION’S CHARITABLE PURPOSES. (2) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE SOUTH WALES REGION AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY RELIEVING HOMELESSNESS AND THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
YMCA
The Walk
Roath
Cardiff
CF24 3AG
- Phone:
- 07980772397
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window