RATBY LIBRARY & COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of social activity for the elderly and letting the building for use by local voluntary organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,723 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 04 November 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Ann Ingram | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Walker | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Freeman | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mike Walker | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Robinson Mrs | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin O'Brien | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maurice James Loft | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.26k | £17.64k | £12.70k | £42.09k | £30.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.95k | £14.48k | £18.57k | £22.10k | £33.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.23k | £17.50k | £3.09k | N/A | £4.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE ORGANISATION ARE - 1) TO PROVIDE A PUBLIC LIBRARY IN RATBY, ENGLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF RATBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR COMMUNITIES. 2) TO PROVIDE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF RATBY, SURROUNDING AREA AND COMMUNITIES, A PUBLIC LIBRARY FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF AGE, GENDER, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID RESIDENTS. 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RATBY, LEICESTERSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR COMMUNITIES BY OPERATING AND MANAGING A LENDING LIBRARY. 4) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF RATBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR COMMUNITIES BY OPERATING A CAFETERIA, ENABLING INDIVIDUALS OF ALL CIRCUMSTANCES TO MEET AND SOCIALISE; PROVIDING A WELCOMING ENVIRONMENT FOR ALL, INCLUDING THOSE WHO FEEL THEMSELVES TO BE OR ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND THEREBY IMPROVING THE LIVES AND WELL-BEING OF ALL RESIDENTS OF RATBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR COMMUNITIES. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); AND CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
RATBY LIBRARY AND COMMUNITY GROUP
Main Street
Ratby
Leicestershire
LE6 0LN
- Phone:
- 01162393157
- Email:
- Ratbylibrary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window