KETA KETI FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1164500
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Keta Keti Foundation runs education and poverty alleviation projects in the mountainous and rural district of Ramechhap, Nepal that enhance children and young adult's access to education and improve family wellbeing. We work with government schools to improve teaching standards and facilities. Alongside this we also offer support to students and families from disadvantaged backgrounds.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2018

Total income: £501
Total expenditure: £60

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Nepal

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 November 2015: CIO registration
  • 12 February 2021: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 12 February 2021: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018
Total gross income £2.35k £449 £501
Total expenditure £2.03k £60 £60
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2018 19 January 2020 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 19 January 2020 111 days late
Annual return 30 November 2017 18 January 2020 475 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 January 2020 475 days late