TROOP AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TROOP AID support injured servicemen and women when they are admitted to a hospital within the UK and World Wide wherever British Troops are serving, they are given an emergency Pack ( Grab Bag) with Basic Essentials such as clothing and toiletries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 2015: Standard registration
- 19 January 2017: Funds received from 1123888 TROOP AID
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Frangou | Chair | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Margaret McLaughlin | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gough | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Sutton | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALBERT TELFORD SUTTON | Trustee | 30 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.49k | £70.97k | £78.52k | £86.10k | £87.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.08k | £101.11k | £91.05k | £82.72k | £84.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/10/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SERVING PERSONNEL OF THE ARMED FORCES, INJURED IN OR RETURNING FROM SITUATIONS OF TRAINING OR ARMED CONFLICT, WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF DISTRESS, INJURY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 21 RADWAY ROAD
SHIRLEY
SOLIHULL
WEST MIDLANDS
B90 4NR
- Phone:
- 01217117215
- Email:
- troopaid@icloud.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window