Accounts and annual returns SUPER SIGHTHOUND RESCUE

Charity Number: 1162933
Charity reporting is overdue by 1513 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 417 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 417 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 783 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 783 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1148 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1148 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1513 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1513 days