Trustees COLLINGHAM AND DISTRICT LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 1164058
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL PRIESTLEY BScHons | Chair | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jacob | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Knowles | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Ann Akrill | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARGARET MORGAN | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP DOCHERTY | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES WILLIAM STOTHARD BSC | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY LODGE | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA SMEDLEY | Trustee | 05 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE HASMAN | Trustee | 05 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BARKER MA | Trustee | 05 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.