THE ROBERT BROWN SHOWFIELD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide land upon which the annual Sedgefield Argicultural Show and other rural pursuits can be held.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 05 September 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN GEORGE BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GREGORY NICHOLAS hart | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID RALPH BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL GRAHAM Wilson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.16k | £1.04k | £1.04k | £1.08k | £1.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £315 | £413 | £0 | £1.39k | £3.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2021 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE ON 10 JANUARY 1975 AND ASSENT DATED 1 JULY 1975
Charitable objects
TO KEEP AND MAINTAIN THE FREEHOLD FIELD KNOWN AS COW GAP (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS WEST PARK) AS AN OPEN SPACE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SEDGEFIELD.
Area of benefit
SEDGEFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Meikles Solicitors
7 High Street
Sedgefield
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS21 3AS
- Phone:
- 01740620255
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window