FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION HOPE CLINIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FGM Hope Clinic aims to be an organisation at the heart of the community providing support to victims of FGM and being a world leader in providing advocacy, education, training, research on all issues relating to FGM with the hope of eventually eradicating this harmful practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 September 2015: CIO registration
- FGM HOPE CLINIC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AISSA SARA EDON | Chair | 11 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kaddy Djiba Muhammad | Trustee | 19 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEQA DIRIE | Trustee | 11 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA ST JOHN-PORTHER | Trustee | 11 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £410 | £0 | £29.98k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £29.98k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 11 May 2025 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 11 May 2025 | 99 days late | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 363 days late | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 19 March 2023 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 30 June 2024 | 515 days late | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF GIRLS AND WOMEN WHO HAVE UNDERGONE OR ARE AT RISK OF UNDERGOING FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION (FGM) BY:- A)PROVIDING SUPPORT, EDUCATION , PRACTICAL ADVICE AND ADVOCACY; B)ASSISTING IN TREATMENT AND CARE OF FEMALES WHO HAVE BEEN THE VICTIM OF FGM PROCEDURE; C)ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND PRACTICING COMMUNITIES IN ALL AREA RELATING TO FGM; D)OBTAINING REDRESS FOR GIRLS AND WOMEN WHO HAVE UNDERGONE FGM; E)PROVIDING A CLINIC WHERE GIRLS AND WOMEN WHO ARE VICTIMS OR ARE AT RISK OF FGM CAN RECEIVE COUNSELLING, ADVICE AND CLINICAL SUPPORT; F)RAISING AWARENESS OF FGM ISSUES; AND G)CONDUCTING WORKSHOPS AND CONFERENCES ON THE DANGER OF FGM, THE LAW IN RELATION TO FGM AND SUPPORT SERVICES AVAILABLE, LEADING TO A REDUCTION IN THE INCIDENCE OF FGM IN PRACTICING COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1536A Greenford Road
GREENFORD
UB6 0HR
- Phone:
- 07442253890
- Email:
- fgmhopeclinic@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window