TOWN LANDS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity donates 25% of the annual net income to the St John the Baptist Church Morton and makes other donations to groups, clubs, and other organisations in the Parish of Morton & Hanthorpe only
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 19 September 1977: Standard registration
- MORTON TOWN LANDS CHARITY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON REBECCA TILLEY | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GEORGE HYDE | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev NEIL GEOFFREY OSBORNE BULLEN | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Susan Woolley | Trustee | 19 February 2013 |
|
|||||
RICHARD WELLS | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRENDA BIRKENSHAW | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR WALLY LAWRANCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER CHUBBUCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERENCE BARNATT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.35k | £7.47k | £9.09k | £7.47k | £12.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.92k | £6.32k | £5.71k | £4.97k | £6.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 8 AUGUST 1899
Charitable objects
1/4 OF INCOME PAYABLE TO VICAR AND CHURCHWARDENS OF MORTON-BY-BOURN AS TRUSTEES OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY. THE FEN DRAINAGE IN THE PARISH OF MORTON-BY-BOURN. THE REPAIRS OF THE HIGHWAYS IN THE PARISH OF MORTON-BY-BOURN. ANY OTHER PUBLIC PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PARISH OF MORTON-BY-BOURN, INCLUDING THE SUPPORT OF ANY CERTIFIELD EFFICIENT PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL OF SCHOOLS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MORTON-BY-BOURN
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Station Road
Morton
BOURNE
Lincolnshire
PE10 0NN
- Phone:
- 01778570903
- Email:
- medisec1@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window