AMERSHAM POLISH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote Polish culture, tradition and heritage in particular within the Polish community in Amersham and surrounding areas. Assist with provision in Amersham and surrounding areas of opportunities for recreation and social intercourse for former members of armed forces who served in the Polish Army in World War II with the objective of improving the conditions of life for these individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Poland
- Ukraine
Governance
- 17 December 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STANISLAW SAMEK | Chair | 17 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Gabriela Mieczyslawa Coutts | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
jerzy latawiec | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ADAM KOMOROWSKI | Trustee | 17 December 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105 | £26 | £200.34k | £1.14k | £2.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £900 | £1.00k | £6.13k | £9.72k | £5.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 18 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AND TO PROMOTE POLISH CULTURE, TRADITION AND HERITAGE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE POLISH COMMUNITY IN AMERSHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS; 2 TO ASSIST WITH THE PROVISION IN AMERSHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR RECREATION AND SOCIAL INTERCOURSE FOR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO SERVED IN THE POLISH ARMY IN WORLD WAR II OR WERE TRAINED BY THE POLISH ARMY AS CADETS AND WORKED AS PART OF THE DEMOBILISATION FORCES) WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE INDIVIDUALS; 3 TO PROMOTE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE COMMEMORATION OF THOSE POLISH EX-COMBATANTS' WHO HAVE DIED WHILST ON ACTIVE SERVICE WITH THE ARMED FORCES. 4 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amersham Polish Club
Raans Road
AMERSHAM
HP6 6LX
- Phone:
- 01494727173
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window