ALDERSBROOK SCHOOL FUND CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 11 November 2015: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MISBAH NAZ MANN B.SC HONS, PGC, NPQH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN HUGHES B.ED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS B.DS BEG B.SC , B.DS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES OF STUDENTS AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY INCLUDING PARENTS AND OTHER VULNERABLE CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALDERSBROOK PRIMARY SCHOOL
HARPENDEN ROAD
LONDON
E12 5HL
- Phone:
- 02089890210
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window