JMB EDUCATIONAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide educational grants to children and students that are socially and economically disadvantaged in Nepal, South Asia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nepal
Governance
- 05 November 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Rose Wirth | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
June Corpuz | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE WIRTH | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL INMAN | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DIANE JANICE HICKEY | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.04k | £23.02k | £25.39k | £37.68k | £34.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.49k | £16.95k | £38.09k | £29.79k | £38.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM SOCIALLY AND EDUCATIONALLY DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS BY (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS FOR EDUCATION AND GRANTS FOR THE PROVISION AND UPGRADE OF FACILITIES IN (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) KATHMANDU, NEPAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Kingsfield Piece
Whittlebury
TOWCESTER
Northamptonshire
NN12 8TR
- Phone:
- 07860214706
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window