Accounts and annual returns DISCOVERU

Charity Number: 1166385
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 29 September 2021 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 October 2020 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 02 September 2019 On Time