Accounts and annual returns The Mouradian Foundation Limited

Charity number: 1165146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 21 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 21 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 15 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 15 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 04 September 2023 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 04 September 2023 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 September 2023 401 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 04 September 2023 401 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window