Financial history The Mouradian Foundation Limited

Charity number: 1165146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £459.88k £107.17k £290.13k £225.30k £298.80k
Total expenditure £409.27k £123.20k £316.14k £191.74k £303.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A