G12

Charity Number: 1165270
Charity reporting is up to date (274 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

G12 is an association of friends who grew up in Ibadan, Nigeria, and mostly living in diaspora but still with family connections in Ibadan. We sponsor a child "Praise Bamidele" through the Living Word Mission Ministry in Ibadand. Through an annual contribution of ?120 per annum per member we have provided for Praise?s school fees, board at the orphanage, clothes and school materials.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 July 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £300

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Nigeria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 January 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timothy Olufosoye Chair 22 January 2016
AYLESBURY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ADEWALE ADEKOLA Trustee 01 June 2016
NEW COVENANT CHURCH MILTON KEYNES
Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days
WILFRED ACHOM Trustee 22 January 2016
None on record
TUNJI BADEMOSI Trustee 22 January 2016
None on record
RICHARD SOLOYE Trustee 22 January 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/07/2019 29/07/2020 29/07/2021 29/07/2022 29/07/2023
Total gross income £3.61k £1.85k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.50k £941 £1.05k £713 £300
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 July 2023 27 February 2025 274 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2023 27 February 2025 274 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 July 2022 04 October 2023 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2022 04 October 2023 128 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 July 2021 04 October 2023 493 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2021 04 October 2023 493 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 July 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2020 28 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 July 2019 14 April 2021 320 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2019 14 April 2021 320 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Long Acre
Ellesborough Road
Butlers Cross
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP17 0XH
Phone:
07950652999