CHALFONT ST GILES MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of a village hall for the use of inhabitants of the Parish of Chalfont St Giles or within one mile of Memorial Hall without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for: (a) meetings, lectures and classes, and (b) other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, to improve the conditions of life for the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 06 October 2015: CIO registration
- 30 August 2016: Funds received from 221265 CHALFONT ST GILES MEMORIAL HALL
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ROBERT PERKINS | Chair | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sumitra Patel | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Eleanor Patricia Mary O'Connor | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ALISON SANTRY | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARY JACKSON | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN ANTHONY PENSON | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEVE WHITEHURST | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH COLIN HUXHAM | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JAMES HOARE | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||
KATHLEEN MARGARET MARTIN | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.89k | £45.54k | £32.08k | £41.76k | £45.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.35k | £34.45k | £27.76k | £41.77k | £37.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £16.91k | £2.67k | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CHALFONT ST GILES OR WITHIN ONE MILE OF THE MEMORIAL HALL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Paccombe House
Mill Lane
CHALFONT ST. GILES
Buckinghamshire
HP8 4NX
- Phone:
- 01494872883
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window