ARISE AND SHINE TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty [or financial hardship] in the UK and Africa abroad, especially in the great lakes region, East and central Africa, assisting in the provision of practical help, guidance and financial support to those in need so as to be lifted out of abject poverty which dehumanizes and causes a lot of financial hardship and suffering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Rwanda
- Uganda
Governance
- 01 February 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ISAAC KAKANDE | Trustee | 15 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
FLAVIA MUGABO | Trustee | 15 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHEL MUGABO | Trustee | 15 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ken Mulera | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/03/2018 | 05/03/2019 | 05/03/2020 | 05/03/2021 | 05/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £1.00k | £1.00k | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 05 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 05 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 March 2020 | 24 December 2021 | 353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/01/2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/01/2016
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN RWANDA AND UGANDA BY PROVIDING ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE GENERAL PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS, CLOTHING/FOOTWEAR AND GENERAL HOUSEHOLD GOODS AND OTHER NECESSARY ITEMS DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 TAYLOR CLOSE
LONDON
N17 0UB
- Phone:
- 07940863341
- Email:
- byamimar@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window