ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS MONTGOMERYSHIRE AND RADNOR BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting Animal Welfare and offering financial assistance and support to animal owners. Providing information and advice on Animal Health and Welfare issues in Montgomeryshire and Radnorshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £33,097 from 33246 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 05 September 1977: Standard registration
- RSPCA MONTGOMERYSHIRE AND RADNOR BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA - MONTGOMERY BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA - MONTGOMERYSHIRE AND RADNOR BRANCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Davies | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Lloyd | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Bunner | Trustee | 31 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
MISS M MCINALLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS S J MCVICAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR A J MCVICAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.88k | £25.40k | £35.41k | £23.33k | £34.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.56k | £26.82k | £18.24k | £35.41k | £31.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
MONTGOMERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GARTH COTTAGE
ABERHAFESP
NEWTOWN
SY16 3LN
- Phone:
- 01686621977
- Email:
- ANDYMAC@PC-Q.NET
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window