MAMA NA MTOTO UK

Charity Number: 1163465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maternal and neonatal health . Prevention of ill health and poverty. Education empowerment. Free midwifery service . Health promotion . Environmental and sanitation .

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £16,313
Total expenditure: £17,608

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City
  • Kenya

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 September 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MOTHER AND BABY PROJECT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anita jones Chair 06 September 2015
None on record
Janice Mcdevitt Lee Mrs Trustee 24 February 2023
None on record
Angela Maria Keating Mrs Trustee 24 February 2023
None on record
CHRISTINA LOUISE BROGDEN Trustee 06 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £22.32k £17.44k £23.97k £11.50k £16.31k
Total expenditure £17.10k £7.05k £12.16k £12.57k £17.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £12.10k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 31 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mama na mtoto.UK
15 Gowthorpe
SELBY
North Yorkshire
YO8 4HE
Phone:
07841527742