HILLINGDON BRAIN TUMOUR & BRAIN INJURY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HBTIG currently are providing for patients and careers suffering from brain tumour and brain injury : Individual support by visits, telephone, email and website bi monthly group support Physio football sessions Counselling Bereavement counselling Neuro support Financial advice Fundraising events A charity shop and support centre DWP advice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £97,623 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Buckinghamshire
- Ealing
- East Sussex
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 24 November 2015: CIO registration
- HBTIG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emmanual Daudu | Chair | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mairead Jennings | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amisha Thobhani | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Simons | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY O'CONNOR | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.30k | £132.96k | £163.91k | £146.79k | £151.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.62k | £112.23k | £122.23k | £134.02k | £157.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.00k | £64.14k | £109.54k | £97.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 05 October 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 05 October 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS, DISEASE OR HUMAN SUFFERING, AS WELL AS THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH. TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM BRAIN DISORDERS OF ANY DESCRIPTION, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BRAIN TUMOURS OR BRAIN INJURY, OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS. (A) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF SUCH BRAIN DISORDERS IN GREATER LONDON, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF HILLINGDON AND SURROUNDING LONDON BOROUGHS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO SUCH BRAIN DISORDERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
394 Long Lane
Hillingdon
UXBRIDGE
UB10 9PG
- Phone:
- 07769323142
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
hbtg.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window