NEW DIMENSION KINGDOM FELLOWSHIP LEADERSHIP TRAINING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Holding church services 2. Fundraising and feeding the less privileged people 3. Helping clean the streets of our town 4. Conducting family life and youth seminars 5. Training youth and giving career guidance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Slough
- India
- Nepal
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 08 September 2015: Standard registration
- 25 April 2017: Funds received from 1152662 NEW DIMENSION KINGDOM FELLOWSHIP (SLOUGH)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR ANDREW CHIKWANHA | Chair | 30 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev LLOYD KADHANI | Trustee | 30 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SATHESH MUTHURAJ | Trustee | 30 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.33k | £28.53k | £24.69k | £54.53k | £53.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.51k | £28.13k | £19.39k | £43.88k | £38.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 364 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 364 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 May 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 04 June 2020 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 04 June 2020 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JUN 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS EXPOSED THROUGH THE HOLY SCRIPTURES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 BEAUMONT ROAD
SLOUGH
SL2 1NQ
- Phone:
- 07799636064
- Email:
- pastor@ndkf.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window