ASSOCIATION FOR DISABLED - SITTINGBOURNE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association for Disabled - Sittingbourne provide social activities and mutual support for physically disabled people in the area.We have theatre visits, shopping trips, afternoon teas, bingo,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 10 November 2015: Standard registration
- 10 August 2016: Funds received from 1096635 KENT ASSOCIATION FOR DISABLED PEOPLE
- 27 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1172770 FAVERSHAM ASSISTANCE CENTRE
- 27 July 2022: Funds transferred to 258197 PARKINSON'S DISEASE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
- 27 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1021367 Air Ambulance Charity Kent Surrey Sussex
- 27 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1152234 AGE UK FAVERSHAM AND SITTINGBOURNE
- 27 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1190373 SWALE FOODBANK
- 27 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1136175 BLUE TOWN REMEMBERED
- 27 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1197326 THE BUS SHELTER KENT COMMUNITY HUB
- 27 July 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ADS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.14k | £9.13k | £8.44k | £13.35k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.08k | £15.45k | £7.14k | £690 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 423 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/07/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN SITTINGBOURNE AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window