MISSION INITIATIVE NEWCASTLE EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mission Initiative Newcastle East (MINE) is a charity which grew out of the work of four Church of England parishes in this area of deprivation as a means of connecting with the community and providing services that would benefit the welfare of the area. Our two main activities are in Youth and Children's Work and Debt Advice though we collaborate on other local projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 25 September 2015: Standard registration
- MINE (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PHILIP MEDLEY | Chair | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Carter | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Higgs | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev HELEN BARBARA GILL | Trustee | 02 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/09/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.64k | £52.18k | £132.49k | £98.73k | £123.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.71k | £27.23k | £85.78k | £145.17k | £98.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEP 2010 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN NEWCASTLE EAST BY SUPPORTING PARTNERSHIP WORKING BY CHURCHES IN WAYS WHICH ENABLE EACH CHURCH COMMUNITY TO SERVE THE WIDER COMMUNITY MORE EFFECTIVELY, INCLUDING: FOR THE EXISTING ANGLICAN CONGREGATIONS TO GROW IN SPIRITUAL DEPTH, NUMERICALLY AND IN THEOLOGICAL AWARENESS FOR NEW EXPRESSIONS OF CHURCH PRESENCE AND MISSION TO EMERGE WHICH HONOUR THE LOCAL CONTEXT FOR LOCAL CHRISTIANS TO DEVELOP MODELS OF MINISTRY THAT ARISE DIRECTLY OUT THE CONTEXT OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC REGENERATION FOR EXISTING BUILDINGS TO BE USED IN A STRATEGIC AND ECONOMIC WAY FOR ECUMENICAL COOPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP TO TAKE PLACE WHEREVER APPROPRIATE AND POSSIBLE FOR THE ESTABLISHMENT OF APPROPRIATE PARTNERSHIPS WITH BOTH STATUTORY AND VOLUNTARY AGENCIES THROUGH STIMULATING INTERACTION WITH THE COMMUNITIES OF THE EAST END FOR THOSE ENGAGED IN THEOLOGICAL TRAINING TO SHARE IN THE LEARNING GAINED BY LOCAL PEOPLE IN A WAY THAT MEANS WE GAIN FROM THEIR EXPERIENCE. FOR THEOLOGICAL REFLECTION ON THE URBAN CONTEXT TO TAKE PLACE IN THE MIDST OF THE ACTIVITIES GENERATED BY THE INTERACTION OF THE ABOVE AIMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRISTCHURCH VICARAGE
105 MIDDLE STREET
WALKER
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE6 4DB
- Phone:
- 07735990077
- Email:
- phil_medley@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window