HOLY SPIRIT FILLED MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Spread the gospel about our Lord Jesus Christ through evangelism activities - these but not limited to home Bible studies, cell grouping, fellowship activities, evangelism, mission & Sunday meetings. 2. Strengthening faith through prayer meeting activities + group dawn watch prayer fellowship. 3. Ministerial mentorship learning through education and training of leaders and brethren in Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Philippines
Governance
- 11 December 2015: Standard registration
- HSF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSELITO CARLO CRUZAT | Chair | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Aireen Diana Corpuz Garello | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARLITO CAISIDO | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.79k | £7.85k | £7.79k | £9.35k | £9.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.86k | £2.54k | £9.80k | £11.30k | £8.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 May 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 May 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 JUL 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE HOLY SPIRIT FILLED MINISTRIES CHURCH. THE PURSUIT OF ANY PURPOSE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES WHICH IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINE OF THE HOLY SPIRIT FILLED MINISTRIES CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Burton Road
LONDON
Flat C
NW6 7LL
- Phone:
- 07779119595
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window