C2C TEACHING ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objective is to advance the education of the pupils at schools within North Staffordshire and surrounding areas by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities at the school including the provision of training to all people who are working for or with schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £23,559 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 19 October 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Connell | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Snee Rossanna | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
McKenna Dominic | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILL JAMES | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.60k | £175.07k | £137.18k | £59.69k | £24.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.31k | £174.11k | £135.84k | £60.31k | £102.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £46.00k | £46.00k | £76.21k | £55.90k | £23.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JUN 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCTION OF THE PUPILS AT SCHOOLS WITHIN NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AT THE SCHOOLS INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF TRAINAING TO ALL PEOPLE WHO ARE WORKING FOR OR WITH THE SCHOOLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 Little Chell Lane
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST6 6LZ
- Phone:
- 01782821995
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window