MIND TO MIND MYANMAR

Charity number: 1165005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Mind to Mind Myanmar (M2MM) delivers mental health training workshops for General Practitioners, using the WHO Mental Health Gap Action Plan - Intervention Guide (mhGAP-IG), in different towns/cities in Myanmar. This is a successful tripartite collaboration between M2MM and the Royal College of Psychiatrists Voluntary Scheme (RCPsych VS) and Myanmar Medical Association GP Society.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £626
Total expenditure: £83

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Burma

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 December 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MIND TO MIND FOUNDATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Damon Mason Chair 03 August 2019
None on record
Khin Thuzar Kyi Trustee 23 October 2021
None on record
Dr Brad Hillier Trustee 11 March 2018
None on record
Sophie Thomson Trustee 11 March 2018
None on record
Dr Nwe Winn Thein FRCPsych Trustee 10 May 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.31k £364 £1.81k £465 £626
Total expenditure £11.72k £1.79k £698 £14.61k £83
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mind to Mind Myanmar
61 Bridge Street
KINGTON
Herefordshire
HR5 3DJ
Phone:
07596536526