Trustees PETHAM VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 1163331

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren Theo Page | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mark Miller | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dave Selwyn | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norman Edward Clark | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jeffrey Coombs | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Acaster | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Margaret Miller | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT MICHAEL SEAMAN DIGBY COLLINS | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW JAMES KINGSLAND | Trustee | 27 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHALA MOYS | Trustee | 27 August 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.