THE SOUTH NOTTS HUSSARS YEOMANRY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is the promotion of the efficiency of the South Notts Hussars Yeomanry by; a) providing facilities and amenities for training and during service b) relieving financial need of current, or past, Yeomanry or their dependents c) providing and maintaining a museum to record the achievements of the Yeomanry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 12 September 1977: Standard registration
- SOUTH NOTTS HUSSARS YEOMANRY WELFARE FUND (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Stewart Richmond | Chair | 11 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Harry Peter Townsend | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason King | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Waldron-Lynch | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Aaron King | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Francis Willmott Hile | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN OLDERSHAW | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57 | £52 | £50 | £375 | £1.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE SOUTH NOTTS HUSSARS YEOMANRY BY: (A) PROVIDING FACILITIES AND AMENITIES FOR TRAINING AND DURING SERVICE; (B) RELIEVING FINANCIAL NEED OF CURRENT, OR PAST, YEOMANRY, OR THEIR DEPENDANTS; (C) PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A MUSEUM TO RECORD THE ACHIEVEMENTS OF THE YEOMANRY (2) THE PROPERTY AND FUNDS HELD AT THE DATE OF THIS SCHEME FOR WELFARE PURPOSES SHALL BE RESTRICTED TO APPLICATION FOR THE PURPOSE STATED IN CLAUSE 4(1)(A) ABOVE. (3) THE PROPERTY AND FUNDS HELD AT THE DATE OF THIS SCHEME FOR BENEVOLENT PURPOSES SHALL BE RESTRICTED TO APPLICATION FOR THE PURPOSE STATED IN CLAUSE 4(1)(B) ABOVE. (4) THE PROPERTY AND FUNDS HELD AT THE DATE OF THIS SCHEME FOR MUSEUM PURPOSES SHALL BE RESTRICTED TO APPLICATION FOR THE PURPOSE STATED IN CLAUSE 4(1)(C) ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Wilson Avenue
Keyworth
NOTTINGHAM
NG12 5SY
- Phone:
- 07812856797
- Email:
- hptownsend@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window