THE GERMAN SHEPHERD HELPLINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public to relieve the suffering of German Shepherd dogs in need of care and attention and promote humane behaviour towards German Shepherds. Providing grants for emergency veterinary care, surgery procedures, training and behaviourists. Providing an advice and support line. Providing assistance to help rehome. Our organisation works throughout England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 December 2015: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brenda Jojic | Chair | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Hocking | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Austin | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Godfrey Alan Gullidge | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.49k | £10.45k | £12.29k | £5.22k | £9.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.21k | £2.87k | £12.02k | £8.88k | £17.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF GERMAN SHEPHERD DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS GERMAN SHEPHERDS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:A) PROVIDING AN ADVICE AND SUPPORT LINE, PARTICULARLY TO GIVE ADVICE ON DOG WELFARE ISSUES AND ASSISTANCE FOR HELPING GERMAN SHEPHERDS WHO HAVE OR ARE LIKELY TO BE ABANDONEDB) REDUCING CRUELTY TO GERMAN SHEPHERDS OR ASSISTING WITH EFFORTS TO REDUCE THAT CRUELTYC) PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO HELP RE-HOME GERMAN SHEPHERDSD) PROVIDING GRANTS FOR EMERGENCY VETERINARY CARE, SURGERY PROCEDURES IN CASES OF NEED FOR PEOPLE EXPERIENCING DIFFICULTIES WITH UNEXPECTED VET FEES. E) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN DOG WELFARE MATTERS AND RAISING AWARENESS OF THE SAME 2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO DOG WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG DOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COACH HOUSE
Horsey Manor Farm
Horsey Lane
BRIDGWATER
TA7 8QJ
- Phone:
- 01278450120
- Email:
- jojic@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window