DEAN FOREST LOCOMOTIVE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
INCORPORATED AS A CIO ON THE 14 DECEMBER 2015 TO TAKE OVER THE WORK ASSETS AND LIABILITIES OF AN UNINCORPORATED GROUP OF THE SAME NAME . THE CIO HAS CONTINUED TO PRESERVE, RESTORE, OPERATE AND MAINTAIN ITS LOCOMOTIVES AND ROLLING STOCK FOR PUBLIC OPERATION AND EDUCATION, PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING AND SKILLS DEVELOPMENT FOR THOSE INVOLVED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 14 December 2015: CIO registration
- DFLG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW CRAIG SEXTON | Chair | 14 December 2015 |
|
|||||
IAN HATTON | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Tracy Garrard | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hawkins | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Louise Kingdon | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Timothy Buffin | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Anne Hill | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD THACKER | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DOUG PHELPS | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RAUFFE HAGEN SHIRLEY | Trustee | 14 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STANLEY METHERALL | Trustee | 14 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
TOM HALFORD | Trustee | 14 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN LESLIE FAWCETT | Trustee | 14 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.87k | £18.88k | £75.58k | £79.82k | £108.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.39k | £55.09k | £61.70k | £95.46k | £101.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 14 Dec 2015 as amended on 11 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
(1)TO ACQUIRE AND TAKE OVER ALL OR ANY PART OF THE ASSETS AND LIABILITIES OF THE PRESENT UNINCORPORATED BODY KNOWN AS THE DEAN FOREST LOCOMOTIVE GROUP (2)TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION, LEARNING AND SKILLS DEVELOPMENT BY THE ACQUISITION, RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, EXHIBITION AND OPERATION OF HERITAGE RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES, ROLLING STOCK AND EQUIPMENT ASSOCIATED WITH, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE SEVERN & WYE RAILWAY, RAILWAYS IN THE FOREST OF DEAN & GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PRESERVE, OPERATE AND DISPLAY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FORMER GWR STEAM LOCOMOTIVE NO.5541 AND BR STEAM LOCOMOTIVE NO.9681 AT THE DEAN FOREST RAILWAY AND OTHER SUITABLE LOCATIONS. (3)TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND LEARNING BY THE CONSERVATION AND EXHIBITION TO MUSEUM STANDARDS OF DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS OF HISTORIC, TECHNICAL AND ACADEMIC INTEREST ASSOCIATED WITH THE LOCOMOTIVES, ROLLING STOCK AND EQUIPMENT AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. (4)TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND LEARNING BY THE PUBLICATION OF PAMPHLETS, BOOKLETS, PERIODICALS OR BOOKS RELATING TO THE ACQUISITION, MAINTENANCE, REBUILDING AND OPERATION OF THE LOCOMOTIVES AND ROLLING STOCK SO AS TO ENSURE CONTINUITY OF PRESERVATION FOR FUTURE GENERATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dean Forest Locomotive Group (CIO)
New Mills
Forest Road
LYDNEY
Gloucestershire
GL15 4ET
- Phone:
- 01452526001
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window