MIDDLETON ST GEORGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide educational and social activities to the community, to administer and maintain a Community Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £5,620 from 5620 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Darlington
Governance
- 08 September 1977: Standard registration
- MIDDLETON ST GEORGE YOUTH & COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Darling | Chair | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Cave | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Gray | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Devine | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louise Nancy Smith | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Miles | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Rachel Goldie | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH LAING | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Marion Susan Ogle | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.82k | £85.28k | £27.39k | £48.24k | £60.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.50k | £54.43k | £44.94k | £40.25k | £38.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.34k | N/A | N/A | £5.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 February 2022 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 February 2022 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 MAR 1971 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 APR 2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO: A.PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MIDDLETON ST. GEORGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE ‘AREA OF BENEFIT’) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTARY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B.IN FURTHANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE COMMUNITY CENTRE KNOWN AS MIDDLEETON ST GEORGE COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. C.THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION AND NON-RACIAL.
Area of benefit
MIDDLETON ST. GEORGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Centre
Station Road
Middleton St. George
DARLINGTON
DL2 1JG
- Phone:
- 0000 00000
- Email:
- msgcommunitycentre@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window