ANNIE WALSH MEMORIAL SCHOOL (AWMS) OLD GIRLS' ASSOCIATION (UK BRANCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDRAISING FOR EXCELLENCE IN EDUCATION FOR GIRLS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 January 2016: Standard registration
- ANNIE WALSH OLD GIRLS' ASSOCIATION (AWOGA) UK BRANCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Luke | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Llewellyna Rogers- Wright | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Genevieve Sawyerr | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dannette Davies | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
JOY FRASER-AMOSUN | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Lizzie Roberts | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edith Wilson | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eugenia Luke | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.86k | £48.51k | £31.66k | £37.13k | £49.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.82k | £38.99k | £28.94k | £29.77k | £53.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/12/2014 AS AMENDED ON 16/01/2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE ANNIE WALSH MEMORIAL SCHOOL, FREETOWN, SIERRA LEONE, WEST AFRICA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 Second Avenue
DAGENHAM
Essex
RM10 9DX
- Phone:
- 07877520199
- Email:
- President@awoga.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window