Accounts and annual returns OPEN ARMS

Charity Number: 1165889
Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 16 September 2024 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 16 September 2024 224 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 25 April 2023 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 25 April 2023 79 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 25 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 January 2022 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 25 January 2022 354 days late Download Open in new window