Financial history OPEN ARMS

Charity number: 1165889
Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £5.32k £13.25k £25.14k £24.69k £24.85k
Total expenditure £5.82k £12.43k £21.10k £25.77k £23.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £16.32k N/A N/A