CHARLECOTE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 14 September 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER IAN COURTNEY JOHNS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Catherine Mary Gilhooly | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LEOLIN LAMPITT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN FRANCES MEASE HOGGARTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.56k | £11.24k | £25.03k | £6.24k | £8.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.38k | £3.14k | £16.68k | £5.55k | £6.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 7 DECEMBER 1946
Charitable objects
PARISH ROOM FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES CALCULATED TO PERMIT MORAL INTELLECTUAL OR PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT OR WELFARE IN THE REASONABLE RECREATION ADVANTAGE OR BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHARLECOTE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Charlecote
CHARLECOTE
WARWICK
CV35 9EW
- Phone:
- 07483 243143
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
Www.charlecotevillagehall.weebly.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window