SKIDDAW U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Skiddaw U3A is part of a UK-wide movement which brings together people in their ?third age? to develop their interests and continue their learning in a friendly and informal environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
Governance
- 20 August 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN RICHARD HUNSTON | Chair | 13 June 2022 |
|
|||||
James Pawson | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Charlton Titley | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Drummond Cave | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Keith Lunson | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann Margaret Alves | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Nolan | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Darling | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Gook | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Peter Davies | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Graham Bradley | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Newton | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.71k | £6.02k | £8.00k | £10.89k | £12.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.88k | £4.67k | £9.66k | £10.00k | £12.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED ON 20 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 16 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 Wordsworth Street
KESWICK
Cumbria
CA12 4BZ
- Phone:
- 07748450085
- Email:
- enquiries@skiddawu3a.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window