Accounts and annual returns MIDSHIRE SUPPORTED HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 1167887
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 31 January 2025 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 31 January 2025 62 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 17 March 2024 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 17 March 2024 108 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 17 March 2024 473 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 17 March 2024 473 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 03 August 2022 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 03 August 2022 246 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 10 December 2021 375 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 10 December 2021 375 days late Download Open in new window