Financial history MIDSHIRE SUPPORTED HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 1167887
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £352.30k £586.71k £502.70k £523.16k £443.58k
Total expenditure £346.16k £511.06k £415.83k £486.27k £551.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.07k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £534.58k £477.72k £482.96k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £26.00k £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 £12.90k £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £26.13k £12.07k £40.20k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £34.21k £16.85k £26.18k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.88k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £476.85k £398.97k £460.10k N/A