Trustees LIVERPOOL SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1163016

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY ROTHERAM | Chair | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Cargill | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Bushell | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Gibson | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Robinson | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MCGUINNESS | Trustee | 12 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY SMITH | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ETHEL SUMNER | Trustee | 06 June 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.