INTERIM SPACES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Interim Spaces prevents financial exclusion and supports creative and community development by repurposing vacant buildings, including acquiring and restoring at-risk historic buildings. These sites are returned to long-term public use, providing low-cost work and development space for artists, makers, start-ups and non-profits, and hubs for learning, events, community activity and enterprise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £144,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jee Eun Lee-Fiorentino | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jules Munns | Trustee | 22 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Neicho | Trustee | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS WARRY | Trustee | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.28k | £78.17k | £119.80k | £105.26k | £294.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.94k | £70.81k | £108.93k | £100.60k | £130.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £53.48k | N/A | N/A | £144.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Feb 2016 as amended on 07 May 2025
Charitable objects
1. TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41
Whitcomb Street
London
WC2H 7DT
- Phone:
- 07552996028
- Email:
- hello@interimspaces.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window