BOXMOOR AND WARNERS END NEIGHBOURHOOD ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Centre and Preschool
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £72,896 from 3 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 15 February 2016: CIO registration
- BWENA (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET ELIZABETH COXAGE | Chair | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Anne Norton | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lloyd | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Durrant | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Ann Elliot | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Dickson | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE POTTINGER | Trustee | 02 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
RONALD DAVID COXAGE | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Angela Antrobus | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Guest | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME ELLIOT | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.09k | £129.31k | £161.65k | £175.74k | £198.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.68k | £136.98k | £155.67k | £180.51k | £185.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £59.69k | £103.24k | £54.59k | £60.55k | £72.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 May 2022 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 May 2022 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.2 TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; 3.3 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT ("AREA OF BENEFIT") SHALL BE THE DACORUM BOROUGH ELECTORAL WARDS OF BOXMOOR AND THAT PART OF CHAULDEN AND WARNERS END AS CONSTITUTED ON 3RD MAY 2007 TO THE EAST AND NORTH OF SHRUBHILL COMMON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Boxmoor & Warners End NA
Warners End Community Centre
Northridge Way
Hemel Hempstead
Hertfordshire
HP1 3QG
- Phone:
- 01442 213339
- Email:
- warnersend@btconnect.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window