ROMAN ROADS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Development of an online database and archive detailing evidence of all known Roman roads in Britain, to be made publicly available. Establishing local and regional studies of individual Roman roads and routes in England and Wales. Promoting the study of Roman roads in Britain, and encouraging public engagement with organisations and societies involved in research and excavation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 October 2015: CIO registration
- RRRA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE HAKEN | Chair | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ian Entwistle | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Albert Edward Hills | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.63k | £12.34k | £8.39k | £27.79k | £10.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.47k | £11.66k | £9.54k | £11.61k | £6.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 July 2024 | 329 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 29 July 2024 | 333 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 06 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT THE ROMAN ROAD NETWORK AND PROMOTE THE STUDY OF ROMAN ROADS AND ROMAN HERITAGE MORE GENERALLY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY (A) CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO THE COURSE AND CONSTRUCTION OF INDIVIDUAL ROMAN ROADS. (B) PROMOTING THE STUDY OF ROMAN ROADS AND ASSOCIATED SITES BY COMMUNITY GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS. (C) PRESENTING TALKS, LECTURES AND DISPLAYS TO SCHOOLS AND COMMUNITY GROUPS (D) PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF RESEARCH AND EXCAVATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ellerbeck Cottage
Ellerbeck
NORTHALLERTON
DL6 2RY
- Phone:
- 01609883167
- Email:
- INFO@ROMANROADS.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window