CROSSCURRENTS UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Crosscurrents UK provides grants to support a range of charitable initiatives with a particular emphasis on the arts, human rights, the environment, the prevention of poverty, and the relief of those suffering from ill-health or sickness, in the UK and the US.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 22 July 2016: Standard registration
- 26 May 2021: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.26k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.38k | £53.29k | £40.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 November 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 14 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 08 November 2018 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 08 November 2018 | 8 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 JAN 2015
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE SOCIALLY RELEVANT ART FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE SUPPORT OF AND MAKING GRANTS TOWARDS MUSEUMS, ART PROJECTS, FILM, THEATRE, POETRY AND MUSIC; (B) TO PROMOTE CIVIC ENGAGEMENT INCLUDING PROMOTING HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1. RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; 2. RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; 3. PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; 4. PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; 5. INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS; (C) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM ILL-HEALTH OR SICKNESS, INCLUDING BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES; (D) TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO ORGANISATIONS WORKING ON ENVIRONMENT ISSUES INCLUDING CLIMATE CHANGE AND POLLUTION; (E) SUCH OTHER GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window