PEOPLE FIRST BRIDGEND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
People First Bridgend is the leading specialist, value-based, user-led organisation, committed to upholding the rights of people with learning disabilities and/or autistic spectrum disorder in the county of Bridgend, to enable them to obtain their full rights and privileges as citizens. We champion the rights of people with learning disabilities and/or autism and enable them to have a voice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £114,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bridgend
Governance
- 12 April 2016: CIO registration
- 21 April 2018: Funds received from 1081000 BRIDGEND PEOPLE FIRST
- PFB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN GREGSON | Chair | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Rees | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Steven Roberts | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ritchie Wood | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Harris | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alun Phillips | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Williams | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.03k | £102.13k | £106.06k | £106.06k | £116.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.84k | £101.26k | £99.83k | £99.83k | £101.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £27.00k | £27.00k | £27.00k | £76.00k | £114.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £68.00k | £68.00k | £77.00k | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE AND SUPPORT PEOPLE WHO HAVE A LEARNING DISABILITY AND/OR WITH AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDER (HEREAFTER KNOWN AS “PRIMARY BENEFICIARIES”) IN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF BRIDGEND AND ANY OTHER REGION WITH WHICH THE BOROUGH WORKS COLLABORATIVELY (HEREAFTER KNOWN AS “THE GEOPGRAPHICAL AREA”), THROUGH SERVICES WHICH CAN ENABLE THEM TO OBTAIN THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS CITIZENS. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PRIMARY BENEFICIARIES FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PRIMARY BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. 3. TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION OF PRIMARY BENEFICIARIES THROUGH TRAINING WORKSHOPS AND OTHER OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING. MOVINGFORWARD/BPFPOLICIES/GOVERNANCE/CONSTITUTION 17.03.15 4. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT THE EDUCATIONAL, PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL NEEDS OF PRIMARY BENEFICIARIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
People First Bridgend
Office 32
Apollo Business Village
Heol Persondy
Aberkenfig
Bridgend
- Phone:
- 01656668314
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window