THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, BYFLEET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved and providing home communion Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 September 2015: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY'S CHURCH PCC, BYFLEET (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernice Margaret Rust | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hazel Prior | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Fisk | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Jane Weston | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Allan Edis | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|||||
JIM ALLEN | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Frossard | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEAN-PIERRE FROSSARD | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.02k | £123.80k | £125.88k | £128.41k | £129.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.40k | £107.35k | £129.75k | £123.61k | £133.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £870 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2024 | 253 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2024 | 256 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 January 2023 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 January 2023 | 76 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 March 2022 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 March 2022 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
124 Church Road
Byfleet
West Byfleet
KT14 7NF
- Phone:
- 01932346605
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window