OKOH AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Family Planning advice and supply of contraceptives to developing countries, more especially Cameroon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Cameroon
Governance
- 07 September 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DORIS SITCHOU | Chair | 17 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ghaetan Sohfeuyo | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diderot Monthe | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULES MONTHE | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2018 | 01/11/2019 | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.88k | £2.02k | £2.25k | £2.46k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.79k | £1.38k | £2.26k | £2.45k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 269 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 269 days | |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 10 September 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 10 September 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 08 September 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | 08 September 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 03 September 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2019 | 03 September 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PERSONS LIVING IN CAMEROON BY: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF FAMILY PLANNING BY THE PROVISION OF FREE CONTRACEPTIVE PILLS TO WOMEN AS A MEANS OF REDUCING ABORTION, DEATH BY ABORTION OR INFANTICIDE; AND 2) THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO HOSPITALS TO PAY FOR MINOR MEDICAL PROCEDURES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
63b
North Woolwich Road
London
London
E16 2AA
- Phone:
- 02036458471
- Email:
- Okohaide@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window