THE INGRAM ART FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and advance the education of the public by developing public appreciation and understanding of visual art by any means including in particular by holding, maintaining, augmenting and exhibiting works of art including a collection of 20th Century British Art
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 February 2016: CIO registration
- MOUNTRIDGE ART FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER INGRAM | Chair | 04 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLARE MARY MAURICE | Trustee | 04 February 2016 |
|
|||||
MARK HARRIS | Trustee | 04 February 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.45m | £55.90k | £540.65k | £64.45k | £53.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247.66k | £225.50k | £312.77k | £332.98k | £317.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.43m | N/A | £507.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £13.78k | N/A | £24.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £5.43k | N/A | £8.51k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £241.61k | N/A | £295.12k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.05k | N/A | £17.65k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £31.22k | N/A | £34.93k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 04 FEB 2016 AMENDED ON 18 AUG 2016 AMENDED ON 13 JUN 2017 AMENDED ON 19 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO (THE OBJECTS) ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, (A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY DEVELOPING PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF VISUAL ART, BY ANY MEANS INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BY HOLDING, MAINTAINING, AUGMENTING AND EXHIBITING WORKS OF ART INCLUDING A COLLECTION OF 20TH CENTURY BRITISH ART; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE FIELD OF VISUAL ART BY ANY MEANS INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING THEM WITH OPPORTUNITIES TO DEVELOP THE SKILLS TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE CAREERS IN THE CREATION AND CURATION OF VISUAL ART; AND (C) TO USE VISUAL ART AS A MEANS OF PROVIDING RELIEF TO THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, BY ANY MEANS INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING PROJECTS WHICH PROVIDE SUCH PEOPLE WITH OPPORTUNITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND CAPABILITIES IN THE FIELD OF VISUAL ART.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8th Floor
6 New Street Square
New Fetter Lane
London
London
EC4A 3AQ
- Phone:
- 02078422000
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window