ALIFYA EDUCATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
After school supplementary classes for all age groups from Year 1 Primary to Year 13 A levels in all school subjects. Modern languages and computer courses are run for parents in the morning sessions.Tailored support for university students is also provided.Different educational activities such as reading and writing run throughout school breaks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 February 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAHAMED ABDI SHARIB | Trustee | 28 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ABDIFATAH HERSI GUTALE | Trustee | 27 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
YAZMIN ELIZABETH HUSSAIN | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
AMAL DAHIR TUKALE | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ABDIRISAQ M FARAH | Trustee | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.77k | £93.95k | £98.31k | £140.24k | £195.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.61k | £84.76k | £91.06k | £144.37k | £175.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £30.27k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 October 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 August 2022 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 August 2022 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 July 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 July 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/02/2016
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY REASON OF COMING FROM IMMIGRANT COMMUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FOLLOWING SUBJECTS: LANGUAGES, IN PARTICULAR THE SOMALI AND ARABIC LANGUAGES, INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, LITERACY AND NUMERACY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19
FALCON ROAD
LONDON
SW11 2PH
- Phone:
- 07983547130
- Email:
- info@alifyaeducation.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window