Accounts and annual returns CHURCH FOR ALL NATIONS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1164737
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 21 March 2025 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 21 March 2025 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 29 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 29 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 01 March 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 March 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 22 June 2022 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 21 May 2022 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 19 April 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 April 2021 50 days late Download Open in new window